HI HB1004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1004
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits individual non-justice vocational programs within the purview of the Office of Youth Services to engage in commercial enterprises, including the sales of goods and services, for self-sustainability purposes.
Title
Relating To Youth Services Programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1004 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1230 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
SB1230 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
Subjects
Commercial Enterprises. ($)
Department of Human Services
Office of Youth Services
Vocational Programming
Youth Services Centers
Department of Human Services
Office of Youth Services
Vocational Programming
Youth Services Centers
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1004&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1004_.HTM |