HI SB1188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends part VII of chapter 353, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to establish the SAVIN coordinator position, to be responsible for managing the operations of the SAVIN system.
Title
Relating To The Statewide Automated Victim Information And Notification System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:20PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1188 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB1034 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB1034 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1188&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1188_.HTM |