HI SB1188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the department of business, economic development, and tourism for the small business regulatory review board to acquire additional staff.
Title
Small Business Regulatory Review Board; Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB774 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1188&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1188_.HTM |