HI SB1182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new definition of parked lunch wagons or food trucks to apply in special management areas. Amends the definition of development in a special management area to include placement of any structure. Amends the definition of structure in relation to shoreline setbacks to include parked lunch wagons or food trucks.
Title
Relating To Special Management Areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPH. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1292 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1182 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB1182 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1182&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1182_.HTM |