HI SB1179 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1179

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allocates a portion of the Conveyance Tax to the Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to partially cover operational costs related to upholding the laws that serve to protect, conserve, and manage Hawaii's unique and limited natural, cultural, and historic resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Funding For The Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17
2021-02-23HousePass First Reading
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 48) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-02-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-19Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-11SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1025 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1179 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback