HI HB1025 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates a portion of the Conveyance Tax to the Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to partially cover operational costs related to upholding the laws that serve to protect, conserve, and manage Hawaii's unique and limited natural, cultural, and historic resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Funding For The Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1179 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1025 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
HB1025 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).