HI SB1174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an independent medical examination and permanent impairment rating examination shall be conducted by a qualified physician selected by the mutual agreement of the parties. Provides a process for appointment in the event that there is no mutual agreement. (SB1174 HD2)
Title
Workers' Compensation; Medical Examination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 8:15AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Espero added as Conferee. Senator Taniguchi discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Taniguchi. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 592). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Say, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1656), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Pouha, Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kawakami voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Yamashita; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Ing, Jordan, Matsumoto, Morikawa, Thielen, Tupola, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Re-referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 10:00AM in House conference room 359. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 326) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kouchi, Riviere . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kidani, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-04-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 206) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |