HI SB1167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to extend leases of public lands for commercial, industrial, or resort use upon approval of a proposed development agreement to make substantial improvements to the existing improvements. Repeals on June 30, 2026.
Title
Relating To Lease Extensions On Public Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1013 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1167 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB1167 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1167&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1167_.HTM |