HI SB1155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of licenses to solemnize marriages for persons of a secular or non-religious organization. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:15AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB1001 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
HB1001 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2