HI SB1153 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for the state comprehensive emergency medical system for expenses related to collective bargaining and other current expenses. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Health For The Emergency Medical Services And Injury Prevention System Branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-26 | House | Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4). |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB999 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
HB999 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).