HI SB1153 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1153

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for the state comprehensive emergency medical system for expenses related to collective bargaining and other current expenses. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Health For The Emergency Medical Services And Injury Prevention System Branch.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-23HouseThe committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-26HouseReceived from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
2021-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-11SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HTH, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB999 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1153 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback