HI SB1123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Gives counties jurisdiction over the infrastructure of the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands housing developments in their boundaries under specific conditions. Requires counties, under specific conditions, to commence maintenance on that certain infrastructure within sixty days, subject to tolling to comply with certain other laws. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 359) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, Inouye. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:02PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB969 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1123 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1123 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22