HI HB969 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties within sixty days to maintain infrastructure, under specified conditions, as part of any housing development for the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Title
Relating To Counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1123 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB969 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB969 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=969&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB969_.HTM |