HI SB1119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governor and the mayors to establish lesser petty misdemeanor offenses and violations during emergency periods, including non-criminal infractions; and establishes a more expeditious system for the processing of these infractions to reduce the burden on the court system. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Violation Of Rules During Emergency Periods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
HB965 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB965 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2