HI SB1079 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1079
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to construct two comfort stations in Makena state park. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Makena State Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, L. Thielen. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1079 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1183 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1183 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6