HI SB1074 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of planning to review and propose updates to the State Planning Act and submit a written report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation. (SB1074 HD1)
Title
State Planning Act; Office of Planning; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamane, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Wakai, Inouye Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 281) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:45PM in conference room 224 . |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB905 (Same As) 2015-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).