HI SB1055 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund costs, salary increases, and other cost items for bargaining units represented by United Public Workers and their excluded counterparts for fiscal years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB1055 HD1)
Title
Appropriation; Collective Bargaining; Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund Costs; Units (1) and (10)
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 8:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, M. Lee, Yamashita, Ward. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 490). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-11 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Pine, Saiki, Say excused (4). | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee; Ayes with reservations: Fontaine, Johanson; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Ichiyama, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-11-11 11:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 31 | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Slom). Excused, 2 (English, Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) One Day Notice 03-03-11. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-11 10:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Slom; and 1 Excused: Ihara. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |