HI SB1052 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - The committee(s) on ENE/GVO/TRA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - The committee(s) on ENE/GVO/TRA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DAGS to upgrade state fleet vehicles to hydrogen fuel cell vehicles. Appropriates moneys.
Title
State Fleet Vehicles; Hydrogen Fuel Cell Vehicles ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/GVO/TRA deferred the measure. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/GVO/TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE/GVO/TRA, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB887 (Same As) 2015-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1052&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1052_.HTM |