HI SB1039 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals student instructional hour requirements.
Title
Education; Student Instructional Time
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB797 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1039&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1039_.HTM |