HI SB1009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of live, nonvenomous male snakes that a government agency may import into the State from 2 to 6. Allows a government agency to import up to 10 male specimens of the genus Pteropus flying fox.
Title
Prohibited Animals; Importation; Government Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:55PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to AGL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to AGR, EEP, referral sheet 1
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1009 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1009_.HTM |