HI HR95 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR95
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Congressional Delegation To Take The Necessary Actions Supporting The Reorganization Of Important Military Assets And Property For Increased Efficiency And Effectiveness.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Congressional Delegation To Take The Necessary Actions Supporting The Reorganization Of Important Military Assets And Property For Increased Efficiency And Effectiveness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR95 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=95&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HR95_.HTM |