HI HR95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR95
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Agriculture, Department Of Health, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And University Of Hawaii To Develop And Implement A Mosquito Control Program That Uses Wolbachia Bacteria To Reduce Mosquito Population Levels Throughout The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Agriculture, Department Of Health, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And University Of Hawaii To Develop And Implement A Mosquito Control Program That Uses Wolbachia Bacteria To Reduce Mosquito Population Levels Throughout The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1541), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR95 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR119 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HCR119 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Mosquito Control Program
Wolbachia
Department of Health
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Mosquito Control Program
Wolbachia