HI HR93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Teacher Standards Board To Accept The National Orientation And Mobility Certification For Teachers Providing Orientation And Mobility Services.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Teacher Standards Board To Accept The National Orientation And Mobility Certification For Teachers Providing Orientation And Mobility Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR112 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 40
HR93 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR93 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Blindness
Cane Travel
Hawaii Teacher Standards Board
National Blindness Profession Certification Board
Special Education
Teacher Certifications
Cane Travel
Hawaii Teacher Standards Board
National Blindness Profession Certification Board
Special Education
Teacher Certifications
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=93&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR93_.HTM |