HI HR79 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR79
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Oahu Regional Board To Assess The Availability Of Long-term Care Beds On Oahu And To Develop Recommendations Regarding The Closure Of Leahi Hospital And Maluhia Long-term Care Health Center.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Oahu Regional Board To Assess The Availability Of Long-term Care Beds On Oahu And To Develop Recommendations Regarding The Closure Of Leahi Hospital And Maluhia Long-term Care Health Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1768-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Gates, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Todd; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Say, Takayama, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Hashem, Ohno, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (5) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1571-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR95 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR79 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
HR79 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=79&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR79_.HTM |