HI HR71 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR71
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Amend Its Administrative Rules To Allow For Commercial Sale Of Rabbit Meat For Consumption.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Amend Its Administrative Rules To Allow For Commercial Sale Of Rabbit Meat For Consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-11 | House | Offered |
2021-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR71 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR83 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR83 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=71&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HR71_.HTM |