HI HR66 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR66
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Conduct A Traffic Safety Analysis Regarding The Implementation Of Traffic Calming Systems Throughout State House District 38.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Conduct A Traffic Safety Analysis Regarding The Implementation Of Traffic Calming Systems Throughout State House District 38.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-11 | House | Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR66 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR78 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR78 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Analysis
City and County of Honolulu
Department of Transportation Services
Traffic Calming Systems
Waipahu
City and County of Honolulu
Department of Transportation Services
Traffic Calming Systems
Waipahu