HI HR66 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR66
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Each County To Curb The Proliferation Of Illegal Vacation Rentals.
Title
Urging Each County To Curb The Proliferation Of Illegal Vacation Rentals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR73 (Same As) 2022-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR66 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR66 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.