HI HR65 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Feasibility Of Negotiating The Transfer Of Land Parcel 81002087000 For The Future Expansion Of Ke Kula o ehunuikaimalino Charter School.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Feasibility Of Negotiating The Transfer Of Land Parcel 81002087000 For The Future Expansion Of Ke Kula o ehunuikaimalino Charter School.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR82 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=65&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR65_.HTM |