HI HR61 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Health Insurers In Hawaii To Provide Coverage Or Reimbursement For Services Related To Palliative Care.
Title
Palliative Care; Insurance; Coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325), recommending referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Offered | |
2011-02-22 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR68 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=61 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR61_.HTM |