HI HR55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR55
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Planning And Permitting Of The City And County Of Honolulu, Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu, And The Honolulu City Council To Ensure Greater Public Input Prior To The Construction Of Wind Machines Having A Rated Capacity Of Up To One Hundred Kilowatts.
Title
Urging The Department Of Planning And Permitting Of The City And County Of Honolulu, Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu, And The Honolulu City Council To Ensure Greater Public Input Prior To The Construction Of Wind Machines Having A Rated Capacity Of Up To One Hundred Kilowatts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR61 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HR55 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
HR55 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).