HI HR38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The City And County Of Honolulu To Plan For The Necessary Improvements To, And Revitalization Of, Hans L'orange Park.
Title
Encouraging The City And County Of Honolulu To Plan For The Necessary Improvements To, And Revitalization Of, Hans L'orange Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2021-02-23 | House | Offered |
2021-02-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR38 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR47 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR47 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.