HI HR24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Honolulu City Council To Extend Historic Property Tax Exemptions To Infill Homes Within The Ewa Villages Historic District.
Title
Historical Property Tax Exemption for Infill Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Thielen excused. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Reported from HSG/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-09 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, Har, Morita, Pine, Thielen. | |
2011-03-09 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Chang, Cabanilla, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Har, Carroll, Morita, Riviere, Thielen. | |
2011-03-07 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/WLO on Wednesday, 03-09-11 10:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=24 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR24_.HTM |