HI HR215 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Identify And Prioritize Repair And Maintenance Projects For All State Buildings Based On Health And Safety Needs.
Title
DAGS; Repair and Maintenance Priorities; Health and Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:00AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR252 (Same As) 2011-04-13 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=215 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR215_.HTM |