HI HR201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Department Of Education To Accept Nationally Recognized College Admission Exam Results For Determining If A School Is Meeting "no Child Left Behind" Compliance.
Title
Replace Hawaii State Assessment with ACT Exam.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Marumoto, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Chang, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR230 (Same As) 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to EDU/PGM.