HI HR197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And The Department Of Agriculture To Convene A Study Group In Conjunction With Representatives Of The Coffee Industry From All The Islands Of The State Where Coffee Is Grown, To Delineate And Discuss The Various Challenges To The Hawaii Coffee Industry, And To Propose A Symposium For Further Intense Discussion Of Those Issues In The Summer Of 2019.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And The Department Of Agriculture To Convene A Study Group In Conjunction With Representatives Of The Coffee Industry From All The Islands Of The State Where Coffee Is Grown, To Delineate And Discuss The Various Challenges To The Hawaii Coffee Industry, And To Propose A Symposium For Further Intense Discussion Of Those Issues In The Summer Of 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Say; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:45AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR227 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).