HI HR191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Mayor And Council Of The County Of Maui To Take Necessary Steps To Adopt And Accept Jurisdiction For Nahiku Bridge In The Hana District Of The County Of Maui.
Title
Maui; Nahiku Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-27 | House | Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 44 |
2014-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-24-14 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-20 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR242 (Same As) 2014-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=191&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR191_.HTM |