HI HR188 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report To The Legislature On The Feasibility Of Increasing The Number Of Instructional Hours In Each School Day.
Title
Public Schools; Number of Instructional Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-16-10 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 48 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR260 (Same As) 2010-03-12 - (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 48
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=188&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HR188_.HTM |