HI HR149 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Support Legislation Requiring The Department Of Agriculture And Food And Drug Administration To Come Up With A Nation-wide System For Monitoring, Labeling, And Enforcing The Labeling Of All Whole And Processed Genetically Engineered Foods.
Title
Genetically Modified Foods; Federal; Labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1384), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Tokioka, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 04-01-13 10:35AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=149&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR149_.HTM |