HI HR145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Convene A Working Group To Examine The Federal 2008 Farm Bill Amendment To The Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act.
Title
Child Nutrition Programs; Farm-to-School Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1255), recommending referral to EDN. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Riviere. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-11 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR167 (Same As) 2011-04-25 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=145 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR145_.HTM |