HI HR143 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Judiciary To Partner With Supporting Agencies And Request Grant Funds Under The Victims Of Crime Act To Establish And Support A Restorative Justice Program In Each County To Allow Victims And Offenders An Opportunity To Participate In Restorative Justice.
Title
Urging The Judiciary To Partner With Supporting Agencies And Request Grant Funds Under The Victims Of Crime Act To Establish And Support A Restorative Justice Program In Each County To Allow Victims And Offenders An Opportunity To Participate In Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1717-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 3:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR143 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
HR143 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR89 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
HR143 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR89 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.