HI HR125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Adopt National Carbon Fee And Dividend Legislation.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Adopt National Carbon Fee And Dividend Legislation.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-03-29 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675), recommending adoption. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR124 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=125&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HR125_.HTM |