HI HR111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR111
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Working Group To Discuss The Future Development Plans In Kakaako Makai.
Title
Convening A Working Group To Discuss The Future Development Plans In Kakaako Makai.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Perruso, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Har, Holt, Ilagan, Kapela, Kong, LoPresti, Marten, Okimoto, Quinlan, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward, Wildberger voting no (16) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275), recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR111 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR129 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HWN/HOU/WTL.
HCR129 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HWN/HOU/WTL.