HI HR111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Review The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Agribusiness Development Corporation And Make Recommendations To Improve The Corporation's Efficiency And Programs To Better Address Current And Future Agricultural Issues.
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation; Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-11 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-14 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR131 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=111 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR111_.HTM |