HI HCR9 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Fertility Preservation Procedures For Persons Of Reproductive Age Who Have Been Diagnosed With Cancer And Will Undergo Treatment That May Adversely Affect Fertility.
Title
Auditor; Impact Assessment Report; Fertility Preservation Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 786) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3544) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Tokioka, Manahan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417-12), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:35PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (5). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085-12), recommending referral to CPC. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-24-12 9:15AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Offered | |
2012-01-20 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR7 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.