HI HCR84 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Department Of Transportation And The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Landscape Hawaii's Public Highways And Roads By Planting More Trees.
Title
Tree Landscaping; Public Highways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Offered |
2016-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR46 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=84&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR84_.HTM |