HI HCR78 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Family Caregivers Working Group To Examine And Assess The Role Of Caregiving For Patients Released From Hospitals, The State Of Their Overall Circumstances, And The Resources In The Community Needed And Available To Assist Them.
Title
Family Caregiver Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 747). |
2014-04-29 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 697) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3489) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3468), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-17-14 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1435-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:30PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takai, Matsumoto. |
2014-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR52 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - Transmitted to Senate.