HI HCR7 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Re-referred to WAL, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Investigate, Evaluate, And Make Recommendations Regarding The Issue Of Managed Shoreline Retreat And Coastal Land Acquisition In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force; Shoreline Retreat; Managed Retreat; Coastal Land Acquisition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseRe-referred to WAL, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 34
2014-01-29HouseReferred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9
2014-01-17HouseOffered
2014-01-16HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR3 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - Re-referred to WAL, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 34

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback