HI HCR62 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Parks And Recreation Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Restore The Field Of Maunawili Valley Neighborhood Park And Develop A Plan To Restore The Entire Park.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Parks And Recreation Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Restore The Field Of Maunawili Valley Neighborhood Park And Develop A Plan To Restore The Entire Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-23. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1924) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 493). |
2023-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780), recommending adoption. |
2023-03-28 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
2023-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR64 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.