HI HCR62 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct Research On The Correlation Between Children Who Are Late-born And The High School Drop Out Rate.
Title
Department of Education; Late-born Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5). | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Wooley. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 38 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-23 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR43 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5).