HI HCR6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Executive Branch Provide Accurate And Complete Accounting Of Public Land Trust Revenues Under Section 5 Of Act 178, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2006.
Title
OHA Package; Public Land Trust Revenues; Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2015-01-23 | House | Offered |
2015-01-23 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR7 (Same As) 2015-03-05 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=6&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR6_.HTM |